EP1790132 - DISTRIBUTED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM USING TWO COMMUNICATION CONTROLLERS AS WELL AS METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/30] |
Former [2007/22] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ungermann, Jörn c/o Philips I.P., Standards GmbH, Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/28] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1102 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/50] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1102 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/22] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 05774640.6 | 17.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005IB52713 | Priority number, date | EP20040104222 | 02.09.2004 Original published format: EP 04104222 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006024982 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790132 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/437, H04L29/14 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
H04L12/437 (EP);
H04L69/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | 02.04.2007 | BA | 02.04.2007 | HR | 02.04.2007 | MK | 02.04.2007 | YU | 02.04.2007 | Title | German: | VERTEILTES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT ZWEI KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES SOLCHEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMS | [2007/22] | English: | DISTRIBUTED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM USING TWO COMMUNICATION CONTROLLERS AS WELL AS METHOD FOR OPERATING SUCH COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2007/22] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION REPARTI UTILISANT DEUX CONTROLEURS DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCEDE D'EXPLOITATION D'UN TEL SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 05.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]EP1355459 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [YD] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0043] *; | [Y]US6467003 (DOERENBERG FRANK M G [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0056] , [0057] *; | [AP]WO2004105326 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [AP] 1-10 * abstract * |