EP1774583 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CO-PLANAR BONDING PADS ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SV Probe Pte Ltd. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states SV PROBE PTE LTD. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALANTONIO, Edward, L. 317 East Eight Avenue Conshohocken, PA 19428 / US | 02 /
LAURENT, Edward 1566 Three Tuns Lane Amber, PA 19002-2709 / US | 03 /
HANOON, Ilan 722 Chapel Road Glenside, PA 19038 / US | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
MALANTONIO, Edward, L. 317 East Eight Avenue Conshohocken, PA 19428 / US | ||
02 /
LAURENT, Edward 340 West Montgomery Avenue North Wales, PA 19454 / US | |||
03 /
HANOON, Ilan 722 Chapel Road Glenside, PA 19038 / US | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05775584.5 | 26.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005US26385 | Priority number, date | US20040591828P | 28.07.2004 Original published format: US 591828 P | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006014894 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1774583 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/48, G01R3/00, G01R31/28, G01R1/073 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
G01R1/07307 (EP,US);
G01R1/0735 (EP,US);
G01R3/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/4853 (EP,US);
G01R1/06711 (EP,US);
G01R31/2889 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1184 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON COPLANAREN BONDKONTAKTSTELLEN AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2007/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING CO-PLANAR BONDING PADS ON A SUBSTRATE | [2007/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE PLAGES DE CONTACT COPLANAIRES SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 31.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003132027 (MARUYAMA SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 7 *; | [X]US5765744 (TATUMI KOUHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2002194730 (SHIH DA-YUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2004130343 (BEAMAN BRIAN SAMUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] *; | [A]US2003080770 (WOOD ALAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 1C *; | [A]US2003038647 (ELDRIDGE BENJAMIN N [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |