EP1786303 - DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A BEVERAGE, PROVIDED WITH A MEANS OF DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE MEDITERRANEENNE DES CAFES S.A. 9ème Rue Lotissement Industriel Départemental (LID) 06510 Carros / FR | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANC, Jean-Pierre Office Méditerranéen de Brevets Cabinet Hautier, 20 rue de la Liberté F-06000 NICE / FR | 02 /
FERRIER, Christian Office Méditerranéen de Brevets Cabinet Hautier, 20 rue de la Liberté F-06000 NICE / FR | [2007/42] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
BLANC, Jean-Pierre OFFICE MEDITERRANEEN DE BREVETS CABINET HAUTIER, 20 RUE DE LA LIBERTE F-06000 NICE / FR | ||
02 /
FERRIER, Christian OFFICE MEDITERRANEEN DE BREVETS CABINET HAUTIER, 20 RUE DE LA LIBERTE F-06000 NICE / FR | Representative(s) | Decobert, Jean-Pascal, et al Hautier IP 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Decobert, Jean-Pascal, et al Cabinet Hautier Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 05775860.9 | 26.07.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005EP53645 | Priority number, date | FR20040051829 | 10.08.2004 Original published format: FR 0451829 | [2007/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032564 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1786303 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1786303 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A47J31/3633 (EP,US);
A47J31/4492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT EINEM ERFASSUNGSMITTEL VERSEHENE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUBEREITUNG EINES GETRÄNKS | [2007/21] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A BEVERAGE, PROVIDED WITH A MEANS OF DETECTION | [2007/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE BOISSON AVEC MOYEN DE DETECTION | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2008 | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | LT | 02.04.2008 | LV | 02.04.2008 | NL | 02.04.2008 | PL | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | LU | 26.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 04.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
LU | 26.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
LU | 26.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 02.04.2008 | |
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5798037 (PEACOCK GEORGE B [GB]) [A] 1-3* column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [YD]WO0228241 (BOYD COFFEE CO [US]) [YD] 1,2,4-7 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph 1; figure 3; claim 6 *; | [Y]US6505544 (BLANC JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-7 * column 3, line 56 - column 8, line 5 * * column 6, lines 30-37; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US6557458 (BLANC JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,4-7 * column 4, line 1 - column 7, line 67; figures 1,5 * |