EP1781752 - COARSE-PARTICLE MICROCAPSULE PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANG-WITTKOWSKI, Gabriele Eichendorffstrasse 41 68167 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
JAHNS, Ekkehard Wintergasse 19/2 69469 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Marco Steinmetzergasse 6 67346 Speyer / DE | 04 /
SENGE, Michael Blomberger Weg 7 32657 Lemgo / DE | 05 /
STEFFEN, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 44 67487 Maikammer / DE | 06 /
KOLTER, Karl Sudetenstrasse 1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
LANG-WITTKOWSKI, Gabriele Eichendorffstrasse 41 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
02 /
JAHNS, Ekkehard Wintergasse 19/2 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMIDT, Marco Steinmetzergasse 6 67346 Speyer / DE | |||
04 /
SENGE, Michael Blomberger Weg 7 32657 Lemgo / DE | |||
05 /
STEFFEN, Markus Bahnhofstrasse 44 67487 Maikammer / DE | |||
06 /
KOLTER, Karl Sudetenstr.1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/39] | Application number, filing date | 05775925.0 | 02.08.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005EP08354 | Priority number, date | EP20040018933 | 10.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04018933 | [2007/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006018130 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1781752 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1781752 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/06, F28D20/02, C04B20/10, B01J13/00 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
B01J2/20 (EP,US);
B01J13/02 (KR);
B01J13/043 (EP,US);
C04B20/10 (KR);
C09K5/06 (KR);
C09K5/063 (EP,US);
F28D20/02 (KR);
F28D20/023 (EP,US);
Y02E60/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2984 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2985 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2987 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2989 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | GROBTEILIGE MIKROKAPSELZUBEREITUNG | [2007/19] | English: | COARSE-PARTICLE MICROCAPSULE PREPARATION | [2007/19] | French: | PREPARATION DE MICROCAPSULES A GROSSES PARTICULES | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 14.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2005 | CY | 26.09.2012 | CZ | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | FI | 26.09.2012 | LT | 26.09.2012 | LV | 26.09.2012 | MC | 26.09.2012 | RO | 26.09.2012 | SI | 26.09.2012 | SK | 26.09.2012 | TR | 26.09.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | IS | 26.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
MC | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 26.09.2012 | |
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
FI | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 26.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]GB870476 (NCR CO) [DA] 1-5,13 * page 1, line 11 - page 2, line 41 * * page 3, line 111 - page 4, line 8 *; | [A]US5709945 (LEE HYEON KOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-5,16,17 * claim - *; | [A]US5804297 (COLVIN DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-5,16* the whole document *; | [DA]DE19749731 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6,16,17 * column 7, line 10 - line 13 * * column 8, line 31 - line 55 * * claims 1,6,9 *; | [DA]DE10139171 (BASF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-6,13,16,17 * the whole document *; | [DX]US6703127 (DAVIS DANNY ALLEN [US], et al) [DX] 1-6,13,16,17 * column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 8 * |