EP1792033 - STREET FIXTURE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technilum Domain de Lezigno, RN 112-Route de Maureilhan 34500 Beziers / FR | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULLIAN, Agnès Domaine de Lézigno F-34500 BEZIERS / FR | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [2017/07] |
Former [2007/23] | CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05775971.4 | 08.08.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005EP53892 | Priority number, date | FR20040051813 | 09.08.2004 Original published format: FR 0451813 | [2007/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006015975 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1792033 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1792033 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/00, E04H12/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
E05B47/0038 (EP);
E04H12/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/07] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRASSENMÖBELANORDNUNG | [2007/23] | English: | STREET FIXTURE ASSEMBLY | [2007/23] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MOBILIER URBAIN | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 31.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2005 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | NL | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | IE | 08.08.2017 | LU | 08.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 08.08.2005 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 08.08.2005 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 08.08.2005 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
IE | 08.08.2017 | ||
LU | 08.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
NL | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0822307 (ATELIERS DE CHEVREUSE SA) [X] 1-7,10 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [X]FR2561624 (KLEIN ETS GEORGES) [X] 1-4,6,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2110265 (* HEMCOL LIMITED) [Y] 8,9 * figure - *; | [Y]GB2375567 (* PUDSEY DIAMOND ENGINEERING LIMITED) [Y] 8,9 * figure - *; | [A]EP0855484 (HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V) [A] 1,8,9 * figure - * |