EP1941726 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS OF CAMERA CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trace Optic Technologies Pty Ltd Innovation House, First Avenue Mawson Lakes, SA 5095 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Trace Optic Technologies Pty Ltd. Innovation House, First Avenue Mawson Lakes, SA 5095 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Jeremy, Lorenz 4 Linley Avenue Prospect, South Australia 5081 / AU | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Burrows, Anthony Gregory, et al Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Turner, Richard Charles 29 Southcourt Avenue Leighton Buzzard Bedfordshire LU7 2QD / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Negrini, Elena Agazzani & Associati S.r.l. Studio Ing. Giampaolo Agazzani Via dell'Angelo Custode 11/6 40141 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 05776080.3 | 30.08.2005 | [2008/28] | WO2005AU01302 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006024078 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941726 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
H04N5/222 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
H04N23/695 (EP,US);
H04N23/90 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (EP,US);
H04N7/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KAMERASTEUERUNG | [2008/28] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS OF CAMERA CONTROL | [2008/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE CAMERAS | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 28.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4120004 (COUTTA JOHN M); | [XA]US5164827 (PAFF ROBERT [US]); | [A]WO9417636 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RES [US]); | [XA]EP0847201 (DAVID ANTOINE [FR]) | International search | [A]US5982420 (RATZ STEPHEN G [US]); | [X]WO0203702 (MULLER SPORTS GROUP INC [US]); | [X]US2003210329 (AAGAARD KENNETH JOSEPH [US], et al) | Examination | US5523783 |