EP1782014 - HEAT EXCHANGER VESSEL WITH MEANS FOR RECIRCULATING CLEANING PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TWISTER B.V. Einsteinlaan 10 2289 CC Rijswijk (ZH) / NL | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAGT, Berend-Jan Einsteinlaan 10 NL-2289 CC Rijswijk / NL | 02 /
TJEENK WILLINK, Cornelis Antonie Einsteinlaan 10 NL-2289 CC Rijswijk / NL | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Verschoor, Bas Christiaan Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Verschoor, Bas Christiaan Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/19] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell International B.V., Intellectual Property Services, P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05776135.5 | 28.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005EP53695 | Priority number, date | EP20040103652 | 29.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04103652 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006010771 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782014 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1782014 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F28G1/12, F28D7/16 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
F28D7/16 (EP,US);
F28G1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERBEHÄLTER MIT MITTELN ZUR RÜCKFÜHRUNG VON REINIGUNGSPARTIKELN | [2007/19] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER VESSEL WITH MEANS FOR RECIRCULATING CLEANING PARTICLES | [2007/19] | French: | CALANDRE D'ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR AVEC MOYENS DE RECIRCULATION DE PARTICULES DE NETTOYAGE | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | BE | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | CZ | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | LT | 07.05.2008 | LV | 07.05.2008 | PL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | IE | 28.07.2008 | LU | 28.07.2008 | FR | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | IS | 07.09.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CY | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
TR | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.07.2008 | ||
LU | 28.07.2008 | ||
FR | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.07.2008 | ||
LU | 28.07.2008 | ||
FR | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 28.07.2008 | ||
FR | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
BE | 07.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LT | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
IS | 07.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
LV | 07.05.2008 | ||
PL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 07.05.2008 | |
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6199100 ; | [A]DE1083058 (SCHMIDT SCHE HEISSDAMPF) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4208220 (WHITE HENRY J [US]) [A] 1,10,11 * column 4, line 19 - line 68; figure - *; | [Y]FR2496861 (CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]) [Y] 2,4,12 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 12 * * page 4, line 12 - line 16 *; | [XY]EP0371859 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1,3,6,9,11 * column 1, line 47 - line 55 * * column 3, line 15 - line 33 * [Y] 2,4,12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860919), vol. 0102, no. 77, Database accession no. (M - 519), & JP61099100 A 19860517 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,11 * abstract * |