EP1797452 - START-UP ASSIST SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOECKER, Juergen Vogelsangstr. 13 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
HOETZER, Dieter Auf Der Hart 16/1 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | 03 /
CITELLI, Silvia Goslarer Str. 70 70499 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/25] | Application number, filing date | 05776196.7 | 20.07.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP53498 | Priority number, date | DE20041047177 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004047177 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006034893 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797452 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797452 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP);
B60W30/17 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP);
G01S13/862 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
B60W2050/143 (EP);
G01S15/931 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9315 (EP,US);
G01S2013/93185 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9321 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9324 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9325 (EP,US);
G01S2013/93271 (EP,US);
Y10S367/909 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | G01S13/93, B60K31/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2011/05] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANFAHRASSISTENT FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2007/25] | English: | START-UP ASSIST SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/25] | French: | SYSTEME D'ASSISTANCE AU DEMARRAGE POUR VEHICULE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.04.2011 | [2011/49] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2309555 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * * page 7, paragraph 3 ** page 11, paragraph 1 * |