EP1776565 - SENSOR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDMEIER, Thomas Mozartstrasse 6a 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | 02 /
CHRISTOPH, Markus Hintere Keilbergstr. 64 93055 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
WIEAND, Christian Heiglbauerweg 10 93173 Grünthal / DE | 04 /
PLANKL, Christian Droste-Hülshoff-Weg 24 93055 Burgweinting / DE | [2007/17] | Application number, filing date | 05776206.4 | 14.07.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005EP53389 | Priority number, date | DE20041034290 | 15.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004034290 | [2007/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006005769 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776565 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1776565 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/24, B60R21/01 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
B60R21/013 (EP,US);
B60R21/01 (KR);
G01D11/24 (KR);
G01D11/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/43] |
Former [2007/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENSOR FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2007/17] | English: | SENSOR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [2007/17] | French: | DETECTEUR DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3557628 (TSUKADA KOJI) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 28 * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 5-7; | [YDA]DE19738803 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 5-7 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 46 * * abstract * [A] 1-4,8-10; | [A]EP0261555 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5029474 (SCHULZE GUENTHER [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US4011472 (FENG CHING C) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 31 - line 48 * * abstract *; | [A]US4771637 (KUBLER JOHN M [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5155660 (YAMADA TOSHIFUSA [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |