EP1776534 - BELT DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOGNER, Michael Forchheimer Strasse 5 90542 Eckental / DE | 02 /
PFLUG, Rainer Schützenstrasse 13 91560 Heilsbronn / DE | [2007/17] | Application number, filing date | 05776437.5 | 22.07.2005 | [2007/17] | WO2005EP07998 | Priority number, date | DE20041039070 | 12.08.2004 Original published format: DE102004039070 | [2007/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006018095 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1776534 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/02, F01L1/02 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
F01L1/02 (KR);
F01L1/024 (EP);
F16H7/02 (KR);
F16H7/023 (EP);
F16H2035/001 (EP);
F16H2035/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMSCHLINGUNGSTRIEB | [2007/17] | English: | BELT DRIVE | [2007/17] | French: | ENTRAINEMENT ROTATIF | [2007/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS6388368 ; | [Y]DE519271 (HORCHWERKE AG BERLIN ZWICKAU) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS58138228 ; | [A]WO03046413 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE [CA]) [A] * figure - *; | [A]JPS62258109 ; | [A]JPS63106453 ; | [A]US3830212 (SEINO T, et al); | [A]DE19812939 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2824599 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [A]JPH0610693 ; | [A]DE10353588 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880831), vol. 012, no. 321, Database accession no. (M - 736), & JP63088368 A 19880419 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4-8 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831111), vol. 007, no. 254, Database accession no. (M - 255), & JP58138228 A 19830817 (FUJI JUKOGYO KK) [Y] 6-8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880426), vol. 012, no. 137, Database accession no. (M - 690), & JP62258109 A 19871110 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880919), vol. 012, no. 347, Database accession no. (M - 743), & JP63106453 A 19880511 (NIPPON SOKEN INC) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940415), vol. 018, no. 212, Database accession no. (M - 1593), & JP06010693 A 19940118 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] * abstract * | Examination | US3775672 | by applicant | DE19520508 |