EP1782334 - MOTION DETECTION IN IMAGING READER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742-1300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville New York 11742-1300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSEPH, Eugene 132 Wedgewood Drive Coram, NY 11727 / US | 02 /
CARLSON, Bradley 7 Indian Well Court Huntington, NY 11743 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776593.5 | 30.07.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005US27100 | Priority number, date | US20040925177 | 24.08.2004 Original published format: US 925177 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006023253 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782334 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10, G06K7/14 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G06K7/10722 (EP,US);
G06K7/10584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/48] |
Former [2007/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSDETEKTION IN EINEM BILDGEBUNGS-LESER | [2007/19] | English: | MOTION DETECTION IN IMAGING READER | [2007/19] | French: | DETECTION DE MOUVEMENT DANS UN LECTEUR IMAGEUR | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002125317 (HUSSEY ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0044] *; | [X]US5635699 (CHERRY CRAIG D [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * figure 3 *; | [X]US6164545 (DANIELSON ARVIN D [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 4, line 15 - line 20 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 6 * | International search | [X]US6637658 (BARBER CHARLES P [US], et al); | [Y]US6173894 (OLMSTEAD BRYAN L [US], et al); | [A]US6585158 (NORSKOG ALLEN C [US]); | [A]JPH08235297 (UERU CAT KK) |