EP1801000 - VEHICLE BODY REINFORCEMENT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Light Truck Co., Ltd. Vsquare Omiya Bldg., 65-2, Nakacho 2-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0845 / JP | [2011/23] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Light Truck Co., Ltd. 1, Oaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0046 / JP | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Light Truck Co., Ltd 1, Oaza 1-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0046 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Yukihiro c/o NISSAN MOTOR LIGHT TRUCK CO., LTD., 1, Ooaza 1 -chome, Ageo-shi, Saitama 3620046; / JP | 02 /
MIURA, Tsuyoshi c/o NISSAN MOTOR LIGHT TRUCK CO., LTD., 1, Ooaza 1 -chome, Ageo-shi, Saitama 3620046; / JP | 03 /
ISHII, Hideaki c/o NISSAN MOTOR LIGHT TRUCK CO., LTD., 1, Ooaza 1 -chome, Ageo-shi, Saitama 3620046; / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Kohji c/o NISSAN MOTOR LIGHT TRUCK CO., LTD., 1, Ooaza 1 -chome, Ageo-shi, Saitama 3620046; / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05776760.0 | 31.08.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005JP15882 | Priority number, date | JP20040290746 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004290746 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006025438 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801000 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801000 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20, B62D21/02 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
B62D33/067 (EP);
B62D33/077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/50] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE | [2007/26] | English: | VEHICLE BODY REINFORCEMENT STRUCTURE | [2007/26] | French: | STRUCTURE DE RENFORT DE CARROSSERIE DE VÉHICULE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2007 | Translation filed | 03.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 13.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09240515 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1,3,4* abstract *; | [X]JPH10236342 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]US5906248 (NAGAIKE NAOFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * sentences 13-29, paragraph 3; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]JPH11170942 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001039345 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]JP2002308151 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]JP2002362434 (TOYOTA AUTO BODY CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2002308151 ; | [X]JP2002362434 ; | [Y]JP2001039345 |