EP1796757 - APHERESIS TUBING SET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifeforce Group PLC Unit 35, Imperial House, Imperial Science Park New Port Gwent, NP10 8UH / GB | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELARONDE-WILTON, Glen James Wicks Kyalami House, 93 Cynoed Road Cardiff CF23 5SD / GB | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Hutchins, Michael Richard Schlich LLP 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | ||
Former [2011/25] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al M.R. Hutchins & Co The Warehouse 1 Draper Street Southborough Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN4 0PG / GB | ||
Former [2007/25] | Hutchins, Michael Richard M.R. Hutchins & Co, 23 Mount Sion Tunbridge Wells Kent TN1 1TZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05777603.1 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005GB03429 | Priority number, date | GB20040019980 | 09.09.2004 Original published format: GB 0419980 | GB20040021585 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: GB 0421585 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027565 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796757 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/38, A61M1/02, A61J1/00 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
A61M1/0209 (EP,US);
A61M1/367 (US);
A61M1/38 (EP,US);
A61M1/0272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APHERESE-SCHLAUCHSET | [2007/25] | English: | APHERESIS TUBING SET | [2007/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE TUBE D'APHERESE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 09.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2012 | 30.09.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9325176 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,9-12,14-17,19,35-38,40 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 1 - line 23 ** page 3, line 8 - line 36 *; | [X]US6045546 (DRAGO JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14-17,19,35-38,40-42,51 * figures 1-4 * * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 38 *; | [XA]US6491678 (RUBINSTEIN PABLO [US], et al) [X] 1-24,26-42,51 * figures 1-4 * * column 5, line 8 - column 9, line 5 * * claims 1-12 * [A] 25; | [X]US2003191005 (COELHO PHILIP H [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,14,18-20,35-44 * figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] *; | [X]US2004097862 (LAMPETER EBERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-20,22,35-42,51 * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0053] * |