EP1827699 - METHOD TO DESIGN A PNEUMATIC FLOTATION COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | PNEUMATIC FLOTATION COLUMN | ||
[2010/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For all designated states ZAO 'NPVZ Uralmechanobr-technika' 87 Khokhriankova Str. Jekaterinburg 620144 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
For all designated states ZAO 'NPVZ Uralmechanobr-technika' 87 Khokhriankova Str. Jekaterinburg 620144 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIDUYETSKY, Marc Grigorjewitsch ul. Swerdlowa, d.22, kw. 127 Jekaterinburg, 620027 / RU | 02 /
GARIFULIN, Igor Fagamjanowitsch ul. S. Derjabinoj, d.25, kw. 72 Jekaterinburg, 620102 / RU | 03 /
MALZEW, Viktor Alexeewitsch ul. Lenina, d.5, kw.48 Jekaterinburg, 620077 / RU | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05777851.6 | 03.08.2005 | [2007/36] | WO2005EP53796 | Priority number, date | RU20040135380 | 06.12.2004 Original published format: RU 2004135380 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006061265 | Date: | 15.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1827699 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1827699 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B03D1/02, B03D1/24, C22B15/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C22B3/02 (EP,US);
B03D1/02 (EP,US);
B03D1/1412 (EP,US);
B03D1/24 (EP,US);
C22B1/00 (EP,US);
B03D1/1462 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIMENSIONIERUNG EINER PNEUMATISCHEN FLOTATIONSSÄULE | [2010/43] | English: | METHOD TO DESIGN A PNEUMATIC FLOTATION COLUMN | [2010/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DIMENSIONNER UNE COLONNE DE FLOTTATION PNEUMATIQUE | [2010/43] |
Former [2007/36] | PNEUMATISCHE FLOTATIONSS[ULE | ||
Former [2007/36] | PNEUMATIC FLOTATION COLUMN | ||
Former [2007/36] | COLONNE DE FLOTTATION PNEUMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/36] | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | IT | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | AT | 03.08.2011 | LU | 03.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | FR | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | GB | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GB | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GB | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
AT | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GB | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2836496 (FELDMUEHLE AG [FR], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4247391 (LLOYD PHILIP J D) [Y] 2 * figure 1 *; | [XY]US4722784 (BARNSCHEIDT WOLFGANG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * [Y] 2; | [X]FR2726203 (GEC ALSTHOM ACB [FR]) [X] 1,4 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5651879 (GONZALEZ PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1* column 2, line 25 - line 31; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE2836496 | US4722784 | RU2038865 | RU2054972 | RU2132749 |