EP1791784 - A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CHLORINE DIOXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Chemicals International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2017/48] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
For:SE
Akzo Nobel Pulp and Performance Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | |||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
For:SE
Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Maria, Kristina Båtbyggargatan 66 120 68 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Maria, Kristina Båtbyggargatan 66 S-120 68 Stockholm / SE | Representative(s) | Akzo Nobel Chemicals IP Group Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2007/23] | Jönsson, Christer Intellectual Property Eka Chemicals AB P.O. Box 11556 100 61 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05778039.7 | 06.09.2005 | [2007/23] | WO2005SE01288 | Priority number, date | EP20040445100 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: EP 04445100 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006033609 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1791784 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C01B11/02 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
C01B11/026 (EP);
C01B11/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 02.03.2007 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | 02.03.2007 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CHLORDIOXID | [2007/23] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CHLORINE DIOXIDE | [2007/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE DIOXYDE DE CHLORE | [2007/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0612686 (EKA NOBEL AB [SE]) [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO0177012 (KEMIRA CHEMICALS OY [FI], et al) [DX] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DX]JPH03115102 | [DX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 26, Database accession no. 1991-188766, XP002317519 & JPH03115102 A 19910516 (DAISO CO LTD) [DX] 1-10 * abstract * |