EP1773128 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE ENHANCEMENT OF CHEMOTHERAPY WITH MICROBIAL CYTOTOXINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pro-Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 189 Wells Avenue, Suite 200 Newton, MA 02459 / US | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATT, David, c/o Pro-Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 189 Wells Avenue, Suite 200 Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US | 02 /
ZOMER, Eliezer, c/o Pro-Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 189 Wells Avenue, Suite 200 Newton, Massachusetts 02459 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Stephen, Robert John, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Stephen, Robert John, et al Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05778058.7 | 02.08.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005US27187 | Priority number, date | US20040598176P | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 598176 P | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006017417 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1773128 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5575 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/5575 (EP,US);
A61K31/559 (EP,US);
A61K35/74 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/5575, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/559, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K35/74, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/16] | A01N63/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER CHEMOTHERAPIE MIT MIKROBIELLEN ZYTOTOXINEN | [2007/16] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE ENHANCEMENT OF CHEMOTHERAPY WITH MICROBIAL CYTOTOXINS | [2007/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER L'EFFICACITE D'UNE CHIMIOTHERAPIE A L'AIDE DE CYTOTOXINES MICROBIENNES | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 13.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/39] | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6190657 (PAWELEK JOHN M [US], et al); | [Y]US6645946 (KLYOSOV ANATOLE [US], et al); | [Y]US2004091503 (SEGAL ANDREW H [US], et al) | [Y] - MEY A. ET AL., "The animal lectin Galectin-3 interacts with bacterial lipopolysaccharides via two independent sites", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 156, pages 1572 - 1577 | [Y] - PAN Z.K. ET AL., "A recombinant Listeria monocytogenes vaccine expressing a model tumour antigen protects mice against lethal cell challenges and causes regression of established tumours", NAT. MED., (1995), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 471 - 477 | [Y] - PLATT D. ET AL., "Modulation of the lung colonization of B16-F1 melanoma cells by citrus pectin", J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1992), vol. 84, no. 6, pages 438 - 442 | [Y] - KLYOSOV A.A. ET AL., "Preclinical studies of anticancer efficacy of 5-fluorouracil when coadministered with the 1,4-beta-D-galactomannan", PRECLINICA, (200309), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 175 - 183 | [Y] - PLATT D. ET AL., "Davanat- A modified branched galactomannan enhances chemotherapeutics: Reflections on manufacturing, pre-clinical studies and clinical trials", 227TH ACS NATIONAL MEETING, ANAHEIM, CA, USA, (20040328), no. ABSTRACT NO. 1 |