EP1784814 - MEDICAL OVERLAY MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Searete LLC. 1756 - 114th Avenue, SE 110 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Searete LLC. 1756 - 114th Ave SE 110 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Paul G. 505 Fifth Ave. S. Suite 900 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | 02 /
JUNG, Edward K. Y. 13420 NE 36th Street Bellevue, WA 98005-1403 / US | 03 /
LEVIEN, Royce A. 43 Somerset Road Lexington, MA 02420-3519 / US | 04 /
MALAMUD, Mark A. 1508 Ninth Avenue West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | 05 /
RINALDO, John D., Jr. 1560 134th Ave SE 301 Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
ALLEN, Paul G. 505 Fifth Ave. S. Suite 900 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | ||
02 /
JUNG, Edward K. Y. 13420 NE 36th Street Bellevue, WA 98005-1403 / US | |||
03 /
LEVIEN, Royce A. 71 East Street Lexington, MA 02420-1944 / US | |||
04 /
MALAMUD, Mark A. 1508 Ninth Avenue West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | |||
05 /
RINALDO, John D., Jr. 1560 134th Ave SE 301 Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05778286.4 | 01.08.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005US27250 | Priority number, date | US20040910421 | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 910421 | US20040912271 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: US 912271 | US20040941803 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: US 941803 | US20040951002 | 27.09.2004 Original published format: US 951002 | US20040972319 | 22.10.2004 Original published format: US 972319 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006017437 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784814 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
H04N9/8205 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0079 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/0013 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/107 (EP,US);
A61B5/1072 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61B5/7435 (EP,KR,US);
G16H30/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/41 (EP,US);
H04N21/4135 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,KR,US);
H04N21/8153 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHER OVERLAY-SPIEGEL | [2007/20] | English: | MEDICAL OVERLAY MIRROR | [2007/20] | French: | MIROIR DE SUPERPOSITION D'IMAGES MEDICALES | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 14.07.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002196333 (GORISCHEK IGNAZ M [US]); | [X]US2001031081 (QUAN LONG [FR], et al) |