EP1786715 - THREAD TENSIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRO AB Box 45 523 22 Ulricehamn / SE | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMOTTO, Renato Strada Cantone Bonino 47, Vandorno I-13051 Biella/Vandorno / IT | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05778296.3 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005EP09619 | Priority number, date | DE20041043867 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004043867 | [2007/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027233 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1786715 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1786715 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H59/22 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B65H59/22 (EP,US);
B65H2555/13 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT, TR [2007/51] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FADENBREMSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/21] | English: | THREAD TENSIONER | [2007/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF TENDEUR DE FIL | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1072707 (LGL ELECTRONICS SPA [IT]) [X] 2 * paragraphs [0020] - [0034]; figure 1 *; | [X]DE8713749U (ELITEX KONCERN TEXTILNIHO STROJIRENSTVI, REICHENBERG/LIBEREC, CS) [X] 2 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0961393 (RUETI AG MASCHF [CH]) [X] 2 * paragraph [0022]; figure 12 *; | [A]BE1004027 (PICANOL NV) [A] 1,2 * pages 3,5; figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [A]US4641688 (GEHRING FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 26 - line 29; figure - *; | [A]EP1095893 (LGL ELECTRONICS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0025]; figure - *; | [A]FR1200676 (FREI) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4875506 (GACSAY LORANT [CH], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 8 - line 18; figure - *; | [A]US5363883 (WEIDMANN ERICH [CH]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 1 - line 5; figure - *; | [A]EP0622485 (LGL ELECTRONICS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]US5343899 (JACOBSSON KURT A G [SE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 14 - line 33 * * column 15, line 7 - column 16, line 43; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2300734 (GABET DENIMAL [FR]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |