EP1801468 - PRESSURE-RESISTANT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1-5-1, Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 1-5-1, Ohtemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASAKI, Takayuki, Mitsubishi Materials Corp. 297 Kitafukurocho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 3300835 / JP | 02 /
SHINOHARA, Katsunori, Mitsubishi Materials Corp. 297 Kitafukurocho 1-chome Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 3300835 / JP | 03 /
ATSUMI, Haruto, Plant Support Service Co., Ltd. 18 Aza Kashiwagi Hirobuchi Kanancho Monou-gun, Miyagi 9871222 / JP | [2013/36] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
KAWASAKI, Takayuki, Mitsubishi Materials Corp. 297 Kitafukurocho 1-chome, Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 3300835 / JP | ||
02 /
SHINOHARA, Katsunori, Mitsubishi Materials Corp. 297 Kitafukurocho 1-chome, Omiya-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 3300835 / JP | |||
03 /
ATSUMI, Haruto, Plant Support Service Co., Ltd. 18 Aza Kashiwagi, Hirobuchi, Kanancho Monou-gun, Miyagi 9871222 / JP | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2007/26] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05778613.9 | 08.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005JP16490 | Priority number, date | JP20040269450 | 16.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004269450 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006030682 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801468 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801468 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16J12/00, F16J13/12, F16J13/02 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
F16J12/00 (EP);
B01J3/008 (EP);
B01J3/03 (EP);
F16J13/02 (EP);
F16J13/12 (EP);
F17C1/00 (EP);
B01J2219/182 (EP);
F17C2201/0123 (EP);
F17C2201/035 (EP);
F17C2203/012 (EP);
F17C2203/0629 (EP);
F17C2203/0643 (EP);
F17C2203/0658 (EP);
F17C2205/0196 (EP);
F17C2209/228 (EP);
F17C2209/232 (EP);
F17C2209/234 (EP);
F17C2221/013 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | F16J12/00, F16J13/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | DRUCKFESTER BEHÄLTER | [2007/26] | English: | PRESSURE-RESISTANT CONTAINER | [2007/26] | French: | RECIPIENT RESISTANT A LA PRESSION | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2007 | Translation filed | 28.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 07.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2005 | AT | 04.09.2013 | BE | 04.09.2013 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | NL | 04.09.2013 | PL | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | IE | 08.09.2013 | LU | 08.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/29] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
NL | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
BE | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
PL | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1165624 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 38-48 ** figures 1-6 *; | [X]US4704539 (DEQUESNES PIERRE M A [FR], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 16 * * figures 1A, 3 * | International search | [A]JPH01124592 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS5852082 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS5393415 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2003139244 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [A]JPS4729611Y ; | [A]JPH10304983 (NIPPON OXYGEN CO LTD); | [A]JPH06193739 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2003139244 |