EP1794503 - HEAT SHIELD-LESS COMBUSTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/24] | HEAT SHIELD-LESS COMBUSTOR AND COOLING OF COMBUSTOR LINER | ||
[2014/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP. 1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5) Longueuil, Quebec J4G 1A1 / CA | [2014/34] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP. 1000 Marie Victorin, (01BE5) Longueuil, Quebec J4G 1A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPATH, Parthasarathy 3039 Pettigrew Cr. Mississauga, Ontario L5L 4X1 / CA | 02 /
PATEL, Bhawan 5922 Long Valley Road Mississauga, Ontario L5M 6K4 / CA | 03 /
MORENKO, Oleg 1542 Duncan Rd. Oakville, Ontario L6J 2R6 / CA | 04 /
STASTNY, Honza 46 David Crescent Georgetown, Ontario L7G 5P5 / CA | 05 /
ZHOU, Jiam-Ming 3312 Aquinas Avenue Mississauga, Ontario L5M 7K8 / CA | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Hull, James Edward, et al Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2012/24] |
Former [2007/24] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05779327.5 | 26.08.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005CA01308 | Priority number, date | US20040927516 | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 927516 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006021098 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1794503 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1794503 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/42, F02C3/14 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
F23R3/12 (EP,US);
F23R3/06 (EP,US);
F23R3/54 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/41] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BRENNKAMMER OHNE WÄRMESCHILD | [2014/04] | English: | HEAT SHIELD-LESS COMBUSTOR | [2014/04] | French: | CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION SANS BOUCLIER THERMIQUE | [2014/04] |
Former [2007/24] | BRENNKAMMER OHNE WÄRMESCHILD UND KÜHLUNG VON BRENNKAMMERAUSKLEIDUNG | ||
Former [2007/24] | HEAT SHIELD-LESS COMBUSTOR AND COOLING OF COMBUSTOR LINER | ||
Former [2007/24] | CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION SANS BOUCLIER THERMIQUE ET REFROIDISSEMENT D"AVION DE LIGNE A COMBUSTION | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 26.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 28.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 02.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 02.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2840989 (WALLACE MACAULAY ROBERT) [X] 18-20 * the whole document *[A] 12-15; | [XA]DE1216022 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 18-20 * the whole document * [A] 12-15; | [XA]US3656298 (WADE WALLACE R) [X] 18-20 * the whole document * [A] 12-15; | [X]US5331805 (MYERS GEOFFREY D [US], et al) [X] 12,13,16-20 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2840989 (WALLACE MACAULAY ROBERT); | [X]US5129231 (BECKER JAMES T [US], et al); | [A]US5307637 (STICKLES RICHARD W [US], et al); | [X]US2003213249 (PACHECO-TOUGAS MONICA [US], et al) |