EP1941592 - FAULT CURRENT LIMITERS (FCL) WITH THE CORES SATURATED BY SUPERCONDUCTING COILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAR ILAN UNIVERSITY 52115 Ramat Gan / IL | For all designated states Ricor Cryogenic & Vacuum Systems 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | [2012/33] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states BAR ILAN UNIVERSITY 52115 Ramat Gan / IL | ||
For all designated states Ricor Cryogenic & Vacuum Systems 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLFUS, Shuki 9 Ha-Meyasdim Street 55521 Kiryat Ono / IL | 02 /
FRIEDMAN, Alexander 31/16 Namir Road 64920 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
YESHURUN, Yosef 83 Hagalil Street 55900 Ganei Tikvah / IL | 04 /
ROZENSHTEIN, Vladimir . 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | 05 /
BAR-HAIM, Zvi . 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/24] | 01 /
WOLFUS, Shuki 9 Ha-Meyasdim Street 55521 Kiryat Ono / IL | ||
02 /
FRIEDMAN, Alexander 31/16 Namir Road 64920 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
YESHURUN, Yosef 83 Hagalil Street 55900 Ganei Tikvah / IL | |||
04 /
ROZENSHTEIN, Vladimir 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | |||
05 /
BAR-HAIM, Zvi 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | |||
Former [2012/11] | 01 /
WOLFUS, Shuki 9 Ha-Meyasdim Street 55521 Kiryat Ono / IL | ||
02 /
FRIEDMAN, Alexander 31/16 Namir Road 64920 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
YESHURUN, Yosef 83 Hagalil Street 55900 Ganei Tikvah / IL | |||
04 /
ROZENSHTEIN, Vladimir . 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | |||
05 /
BAR-HAIM, Zvi . 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | |||
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
WOLFUS, Shuki 9 Ha-Meyasdim Street 55521 Kiryat Ono / IL | ||
02 /
FRIEDMAN, Alexander 31/16 Namir Road 64920 Tel Aviv / IL | |||
03 /
YESHURUN, Yosef 83 Hagalil Street 55900 Ganei Tikvah / IL | |||
04 /
ROZENSHTEIN, Vladimir 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | |||
05 /
BAR-HAIM, Zvi 18960 En Harod Ihud / IL | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/18] | Taor, Simon Edward William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 05779420.8 | 07.09.2005 | [2008/28] | WO2005IL00948 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007029224 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1941592 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1941592 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02, H01F29/14 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
H02H9/023 (EP,US);
H01F29/14 (EP,US);
H02H9/021 (EP,US);
H01F2006/001 (EP,US);
H01F36/00 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/28] | Title | German: | FEHLERSTROMBEGRENZER (FCL) MIT DURCH SUPRALEITENDEN SPULEN GESÄTTIGTEN KERNEN | [2008/28] | English: | FAULT CURRENT LIMITERS (FCL) WITH THE CORES SATURATED BY SUPERCONDUCTING COILS | [2008/28] | French: | LIMITEURS DE COURANT DE DÉFAUT (FCL) AVEC DES NOYAUX SATURÉS PAR DES BOBINES SUPRACONDUCTRICES | [2008/28] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2005 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | LU | 07.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LU | 07.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | BE | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002118956 ; | [Y]WO2004068670 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL], et al) [Y] 1-6,11 * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 30; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US2003117228 (HAUGS ESPEN [NO], et al) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0039] - [0043]; figure 1b *; | [A]GB392865 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 8,13 * page 1, line 78 - line 86; figure 2 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020419), vol. 2002, no. 08, & JP2002118956 A 20020419 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-6,11 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2004068670 |