Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006024929 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2009 | A3 | WO2006024929 | 09.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IN1674DE2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8308726 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2012 | B2 | US2006052666 | 09.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IN1674DE2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1784526 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2019 | B1 | EP1784526 | 22.03.2017 | A4 | EP1784526 | 16.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IN1674DE2004 | WO2005IB02584 | 01.09.2005 |