EP1784526 - AN ELECTROMAGNETICALLY CONTROLLED TISSUE CAVITY DISTENDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kumar, Atul Anil Hospital C-13 Deepak Marg MD Road Jaipur 302 004 / IN | For all designated states Kumar, Alka Anil Hospital C-13 Deepak Marg MD Road Jaipur 302 004 / IN | [2007/33] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Kumar, Atul Anil Hospital C-13 Deepak Marg MD Road Jaipur 302 004 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/33] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
KUMAR, Alka Anil Hospital, C-13, Deepak Marg, MD Road Jaipur 302 004 / IN | Representative(s) | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2019/43] |
Former [2007/36] | Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/20] | Postiglione, Ferruccio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05779601.3 | 01.09.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005IB02584 | Priority number, date | IN2004DEL1674 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: IN DE16742004 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006024929 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784526 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784526 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/015, A61M1/00, A61M3/02, A61M29/00, A61M31/00 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
A61M31/00 (EP,US);
A61B1/015 (EP,US);
A61M29/00 (EP,US);
A61M3/0202 (EP,US);
A61M3/0216 (EP,US);
A61M3/0258 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | C23F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/43] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCH GESTEUERTES GEWEBEHOHLRAUMDEHNUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/20] | English: | AN ELECTROMAGNETICALLY CONTROLLED TISSUE CAVITY DISTENDING SYSTEM | [2007/20] | French: | SYSTEME DE DILATATION DE CAVITES DE TISSU A COMMANDE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 18.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2018 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.12.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2005 | AT | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | NL | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
NL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 23.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3900022 (WIDRAN JERROLD) [Y] 1-9,18,20-25,30,32-41 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 43 *; | [A]EP0529902 (SMITH & NEPHEW DYONICS [US]) [A] 1-41 * abstract ** page 3, line 30 - page 5, line 56 *; | [Y]US6416498 (FREZZA PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 1-9,18,20-25,30,32-41 * abstract * * column 4, lines 6-32 * | International search | [A]US4294251 (GREENWALD A SETH, et al); | [A]US4941872 (FELIX AUGUSTUS [US], et al) | Examination | US4921477 | US2002173774 |