EP1771782 - SINGLE SIGN-ON WITH COMMON ACCESS CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Geschäftshaus Herrenacker 15 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2008/41] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARION, Donald, E. 1706 P Street, NW Washington, DC 20036 / US | 02 /
JEWELL, Andrew, W. 8605 Chadbourne Road Dallas, TX 75209 / US | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05779764.9 | 27.06.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005US23052 | Priority number, date | US20040582664P | 25.06.2004 Original published format: US 582664 P | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006004815 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1771782 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1771782 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, H04L29/06 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H04L63/0815 (EP,US);
G06F21/335 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/41 (EP,US);
H04L63/0807 (EP,US);
H04L63/0853 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SINGLE SIGN-ON MIT GEWÖHNLICHER ZUGANGSKARTE | [2007/15] | English: | SINGLE SIGN-ON WITH COMMON ACCESS CARD | [2007/15] | French: | OUVERTURE DE SESSION UNIQUE AVEC UNE CARTE D'ACCES COMMUNE | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | BE | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | IE | 27.06.2009 | LU | 27.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.06.2009 | ||
LU | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.06.2009 | ||
LU | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
IE | 27.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2001045451 (TAN WARREN YUNG-HANG [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] * * figures 4,5 *; | [X]US6421768 (PURPURA STEPHEN J [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 62 ** figure 2 * |