EP1774722 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOAD BALANCING IN A WIRELESS LAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHONG, Zhun P.O. Box 3001 Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510-8001 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Ledeboer, Johannes Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Ledeboer, Johannes Albertus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Postbus 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05779811.8 | 25.07.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005IB52500 | Priority number, date | US20040592931P | 30.07.2004 Original published format: US 592931 P | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006013533 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774722 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H04W28/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/122 (KR);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR LASTAUSGLEICH IN EINEM WLAN | [2007/16] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOAD BALANCING IN A WIRELESS LAN | [2007/16] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EQUILIBRAGE DE LA CHARGE DANS UN RESEAU LOCAL D'ENTREPRISE SANS FIL | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 01.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003139197 (KOSTIC ZORAN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]WO2004028175 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * page 31, line 25 - page 32, line 21 *; | [A]US2004001467 (CROMER DARYL CARVIS [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0043] *; | [A]WO2004004227 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-21 * page 17, line 21 - page 18, line 18 * |