EP1766085 - APTAMER-NANOPARTICLE CONJUGATES AND METHOD OF USE FOR TARGET ANALYTE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanosphere, Inc. 4088 Commercial Avenue Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Uwe, R. 3300 Country Lane Waukegan, IL 60087 / US | 02 /
STORHOFF, James, J. 1735 Washington Street Evanston, IL 60202 / US | 03 /
SENICAL, Michael, J. 2049 W. Morse Ave., Unit 3 Chicago, IL 60645 / US | 04 /
GARIMELLA, Viswanadham 15 Montgomery lane Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
MÜLLER, Uwe, R. 3300 Country Lane Waukegan, IL 60087 / US | ||
02 /
STORHOFF, James, J. 1735 Washington Street Evanston, IL 60202 / US | |||
03 /
SENICAL, Michael, J. 2049 W Morse Ave. Apt. 3W Chicago IL 60645-5034 / US | |||
04 /
GARIMELLA, Viswanadham 15 Montgomery lane Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
MÜLLER, Uwe, R. 3300 Country Lane Waukegan, IL 60087 / US | ||
02 /
STORHOFF, James, J. 1735 Washington Street Evanston, IL 60202 / US | |||
03 /
SENICAL, Michael, J. 1759 Huntington Court Wheeling, IL 60090 / US | |||
04 /
GARIMELLA, Viswanadham 15 Montgomery lane Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Nikolaistrasse 15 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05779974.4 | 03.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US16201 | Priority number, date | US20040567874P | 03.05.2004 Original published format: US 567874 P | US20040995051 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: US 995051 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005113817 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1766085 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1766085 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/53, C12N15/11 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/587 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/115 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6825 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/54326 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2563/137, C12Q2563/131, C12Q2525/205 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2565/601, C12Q2563/155, C12Q2525/151 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APTAMER-NANOPARTIKELKONJUGATE UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION VON ZIELANALYTEN | [2007/13] | English: | APTAMER-NANOPARTICLE CONJUGATES AND METHOD OF USE FOR TARGET ANALYTE DETECTION | [2007/13] | French: | CONJUGUES NANOPARTICULES-APTAMERES, ET LEUR PROCEDE D'UTILISATION POUR DETECTER UN ANALYTE CIBLE | [2009/11] |
Former [2007/13] | CONJUGUÉS NANOPARTICULES-APTAMÈRES, ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION POUR DÉTECTER UN ANALYTE CIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | IT | 11.03.2009 | LT | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | PL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | IE | 03.05.2009 | LU | 03.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | IS | 11.07.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
LU | 03.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
LU | 03.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
IT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
IE | 03.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9640991 (NEXSTAR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 1-32,59-78 * abstract * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 5 * * page 10, line 19 - page 13, line 7 * * claims 1-13 *; | [A]US5843653 (GOLD LARRY [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO0011446 (UNIV VIRGINIA [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO0070329 (UNIV BRANDEIS [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US6303316 (KIEL JOHNATHAN L [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [X]US2002037506 (LIN YUN [US], et al) [X] 1-32,59-78 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0058] * * claims 1-29 *; | [A]US6506564 (MIRKIN CHAD A [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO03050290 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO03062422 (UNIV MCMASTER [CA], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US2003143580 (STRAUS DON [US]) [A] * abstract *; | [X]US2003162216 (GOLD LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-47,58-80 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0113] * * claims 1-23 *; | [A]WO03075765 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO03095973 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US6680377 (STANTON MARTIN [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [X]WO2004013628 (APPLERA CORP [US]) [X] 33-58,79,80 * abstract * * page 1, line 30 - page 2, line 25 * * page 10, line 30 - page 13, line 27 *; | [PX]WO2005008222 (NANOSPHERE INC [US], et al) [PX] 33-58 * abstract * * claims 1-75 *; | [A] - FAMULOK M ET AL, "APTAMERS AS TOOLS IN MOLECULE BIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY", CURRENT TOPICS IN MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN,, DE, (1999), vol. 243, ISSN 0070-217X, pages 123 - 136, XP002952168 [A] * abstract * | [A] - POTYRAILO R A ET AL, "ADAPTING SELECTED NUCLEIC ACID LIGANDS (APTAMERS) TO BIOSENSORS", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19980815), vol. 70, no. 16, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3419 - 3425, XP000784025 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac9802325 | by applicant | WO9640991 | US2002037506 | US2003162216 | WO2004013628 | WO2005008222 | - TAN, PNAS, (2004), vol. 101, pages 15027 - 15032 | - WELLER, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1993), vol. 32, page 41 | - HENGLEIN, TOP. CURR. CHEM., (1988), vol. 143, page 113 | - HENGLEIN, CHEM. REV., (1989), vol. 89, page 1861 | - BRUS, APPL. PHYS. A., (1991), vol. 53, page 465 | - BAHNCMANN, Photochemical Conversion and Storage of Solar Energy, (1991), page 251 | - WANG; HERRON, J. PHYS. CHEM., (1991), vol. 95, page 525 | - OLSHAVSKY ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, page 9438 | - USHIDA ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1992), vol. 95, page 5382 | - BASSELL ET AL., J. CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 126, pages 863 - 876 | - BRAUN-HOWLAND ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1992), vol. 13, pages 928 - 931 |