EP1784641 - RECEPTOR PROTEIN TYROSINE PHOSPHATASE GAMMA (PTPRG) AS MARKER FOR DENDRITIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consorzio Per Gli Studi Universitari In Verona Via dell'Artigliere, 8 37129 Verona / IT | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SORIO, Claudio Via Gabriele Rossetti, 4 I-37124 Verona / IT | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Ferro, Stefano Europatent-Euromark S.r.l. Via A. Locatelli, 20 I-37122 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Ferro, Stefano Europatent-Euromark S.r.l. Via A. Locatelli, 20 I-37122 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 05780140.9 | 15.07.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005IB02027 | Priority number, date | IT2004VI00174 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: IT VI20040174 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006008633 | Date: | 26.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784641 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G01N33/5047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REZEPTOR PROTEIN TYROSIN PHOSPHATASE GAMMA (PTPRG) ALS MARKER FÜR DENDRITISCHE ZELLEN | [2007/20] | English: | RECEPTOR PROTEIN TYROSINE PHOSPHATASE GAMMA (PTPRG) AS MARKER FOR DENDRITIC CELLS | [2007/20] | French: | PROTEINE TYROSINE PHOSPHATASE GAMMA DU TYPE RECEPTEUR COMME MARQUEUR DES CELLULES DENDRITIQUES | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA] - SORIO CLAUDIO ET AL, "Receptor protein tyrosine phosphatase gamma, Ptp-gamma, regulates hematopoietic differentiation", BLOOD, (1997), vol. 90, no. 1, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 49 - 57, XP002378640 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - LIU SULING ET AL, "Function analysis of estrogenically regulated protein tyrosine phosphatase gamma (PTPgamma) in human breast cancer cell line MCF-7.", ONCOGENE, (20040212), vol. 23, no. 6, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 1256 - 1262, XP002378641 [A] 1-21 * page 1256 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1207235 |