EP1787759 - STAPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAX CO., LTD. 6-6, Nihonbashi Hakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8502 / JP | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIHARA, Shinpei c/o MAX CO.,LTD., 6-6 Nihonbashihakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokio 103-8502 / JP | [2010/03] |
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
SUGIHARA, Shinpei c/o MAX CO.,LTD.,6-6 Nihonbashihakozaki-cho Chuo-ku Tokio 103-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
SUGIHARA, Shinpei / JP | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05781346.1 | 01.09.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005JP16028 | Priority number, date | JP20040259903 | 07.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004259903 | [2007/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006027999 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787759 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787759 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25C5/02, B27F7/19 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B27F7/21 (EP,US);
B25C5/02 (KR);
B25C5/0207 (KR);
B25C5/11 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2007/43] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLAMMERMASCHINE | [2007/21] | English: | STAPLER | [2007/21] | French: | AGRAFEUSE | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2007 | Translation filed | 06.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 11.04.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 08.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4485955 (HAGEMANN CASPER W [US]) [A] 1-6* columns 4-6; figure - *; | [A]US5791548 (UDAGAWA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * columns 5-8; figure - *; | [X]US5799935 (YAMANUSHI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * columns 4-7; figure - * | International search | [A]JPH0683281U ; | [A]JPH0294083U ; | [A]JPH0329274U | by applicant | US5799935 |