EP1902147 - EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR HARDENING TREATMENT OF METALLIC PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cinetic ETFA Linking 10 rue du 47ème R.A. 70400 Hericourt / FR | For all designated states Celes 89 bis, Rue Principale 68610 Lautenbach / FR | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAILLS, Jean-Michel c/o Cinetic Etfa Linking 10, rue du 47ème Régiment d'Artillerie F-70400 Hericourt / FR | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05781691.0 | 01.07.2005 | [2008/13] | WO2005EP09171 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003222 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902147 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902147 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/10, C21D9/30 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
C21D9/30 (EP,US);
C21D1/09 (EP,US);
C21D1/10 (EP,US);
C21D1/42 (EP,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HÄRTUNGSBEHANDLUNG VON METALLTEILEN | [2008/13] | English: | EQUIPMENT AND METHOD FOR HARDENING TREATMENT OF METALLIC PARTS | [2008/13] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE DURCISSEMENT DE PIÈCES MÉTALLIQUES | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 12.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.11.2008 | BE | 12.11.2008 | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | DK | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IT | 12.11.2008 | LT | 12.11.2008 | NL | 12.11.2008 | PL | 12.11.2008 | RO | 12.11.2008 | SI | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | BG | 12.02.2009 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | IS | 12.03.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | HU | 13.05.2009 | GB | 01.07.2009 | IE | 01.07.2009 | LU | 01.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
LU | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
IE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
GB | 01.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
DK | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
BE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 12.11.2008 | |
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
NL | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 12.11.2008 | |
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3738636 (REINKE F, et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2205513 (KESSLER KG MASCHF) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4459451 (REGELE PAUL [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3737694 (AEG ELOTHERM GMBH) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6160247 (STORM JOHN M [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0236985 (CONTOUR HARDENING INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10141645 (ELOTHERM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6555800 (ZAHN ANDREAS [DE]) [AD] 1-16* the whole document * |