18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
14.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
07.09.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
20.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
25.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
21.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
30.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
21.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.07.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
06.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.04.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
24.07.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
First examination report |
|
18.03.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.10.2007 [2007/41] |
29.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
16.03.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
10.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|