EP1802115 - PERSON ESTIMATION DEVICE AND METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8654 / JP | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Naoto c/o Pioneer Corporation Sougou Kenkyusho. 1-1, Fujimi 6-chome Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama; 3502288 / JP | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05782070.6 | 07.09.2005 | [2007/26] | WO2005JP16395 | Priority number, date | JP20040262154 | 09.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004262154 | [2007/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006028116 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1802115 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76, G06T1/00, H04N5/91 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H04H60/37 (EP,US);
H04H60/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSONENSCHÄTZUNGSEINRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2007/26] | English: | PERSON ESTIMATION DEVICE AND METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2007/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'EVALUATION DES PERSONNES ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2007/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2007 | Translation filed | 05.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 07.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002051300 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2003529136 |