EP1795132 - ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/24] | ULTRASONIC VIBRATOR, ULTRASONIC VIBRATOR ARRAY, AND ULTRASONIC ENDOSCOPE DEVICE | ||
[2008/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Yukihiko 1-14-13-804, Ho Yoshikawa-shi, Saitama 3420041 / JP | 02 /
Wakabayashi, Katsuhiro 2-36-7, Akatsukicho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920043 / JP | 03 /
Mizunuma, Akiko 9-18-1101, Shincho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920065 / JP | 04 /
Imahashi, Takuya 3-13-2, Sugesengoku, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa; 2140006 / JP | 05 /
Sato, Sunao 2974-24-308, Ishikawacho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920032 / JP | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05782223.1 | 06.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005JP16341 | Priority number, date | JP20040273074 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004273074 | JP20040273075 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004273075 | JP20040282956 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004282956 | [2007/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006033232 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1795132 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1795132 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12, A61B8/00 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/4281 (EP,US);
A61B8/445 (EP,US);
A61B8/4483 (EP,US);
A61B8/4494 (EP,US);
B06B1/0633 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/24] | A61B8/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/52] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLVIBRATOR | [2011/12] | English: | ULTRASONIC TRANSDUCER | [2011/12] | French: | VIBRATEUR ULTRASONORE | [2011/12] |
Former [2007/24] | ULTRASCHALLVIBRATOR, ULTRASCHALLVIBRATOR-ANORDNUNG UND ULTRASCHALL-ENDOSKOPVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2007/24] | ULTRASONIC VIBRATOR, ULTRASONIC VIBRATOR ARRAY, AND ULTRASONIC ENDOSCOPE DEVICE | ||
Former [2007/24] | VIBRATEUR ULTRASONORE, ENSEMBLE DE VIBRATEURS ULTRASONORES ET DISPOSITIF D ENDOSCOPE ULTRASONORE | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2007 | Translation filed | 14.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10013779.3 / EP2305124 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5648942 (KUNKEL III HARRY A [US]); | [X]JPH11205899 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US6104126 (GILMORE JAMES MICHAEL [US]); | [X]EP1384525 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US2004100163 (BAUMGARTNER CHARLES E [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPH04152800 (NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO); | [Y]JPH10285695 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JPH11501245 ; | [Y]JPH11205899 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | US5648942 | JPH11205899 | EP1384525 | US2004100163 |