EP1784213 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO MENINGOCOCCAL OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/20] | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO MENINGOCOCCAL OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | [2014/44] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena SI / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTER, Philipp Chiron Vaccines Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
RAPPUOLI, Rino Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
PIZZA, Mariagrazia Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | [2014/44] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
OSTER, Philipp Chiron Vaccines Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | ||
02 /
RAPPUOLI, Rino Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | |||
03 /
PIZZA, Mariagrazia Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina, 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/44] |
Former [2007/20] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05782411.2 | 05.09.2005 | [2014/44] | WO2005IB02801 | Priority number, date | GB20040019627 | 03.09.2004 Original published format: GB 0419627 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006024946 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784213 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784213 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/095 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
A61K39/095 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | 15.03.2007 | BA | 15.03.2007 | HR | 15.03.2007 | MK | 15.03.2007 | YU | 15.03.2007 | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN BEZÜGLICH MENINGOCOCCALE AUSSENMEMBRANPROTEINEN | [2014/44] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO MENINGOCOCCAL OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES | [2014/44] | French: | AMELIORATIONS EN RAPPORT AVEC LES VESICULES DE LA MEMBRANE EXTERIEURE DE MENINGOCOQUE | [2014/44] |
Former [2007/20] | VERBESSERUNGEN BEZÜGLICH MENINGOCOCCALE AUSSENMEMBRANPROTEINEN | ||
Former [2007/20] | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO MENINGOCOCCAL OUTER MEMBRANE VESICLES | ||
Former [2007/20] | AMELIORATIONS EN RAPPORT AVEC LES VESICULES DE LA MEMBRANE EXTERIEURE DE MENINGOCOQUE | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 17.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2005 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0209643 (CHILDREN S HOSPITAL OAKLAND RE [US], et al) [X] 1-10,19-24,29-36,40,41,47 * page 22, line 21 - page 25, line 8; claims 14,15,29,30 *; | [X]WO03105890 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [X] 29-36,40,41 * page 14, line 4 - line 20; claims 1,12,13 * * page 4, line 3 - line 9 *; | [Y]WO2004054611 (NASJONALT FOLKEHELSEINSTITUTT [NO], et al) [Y] 1-10,19-24,29-36,47 * page 15, line 26 - page 16, line 9; claims 1,15 *; | [Y]WO2004019977 (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 1-10,19-24,29-36,47 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 18 *; | [Y]WO2004014418 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE BIOLOG SA [BE], et al) [Y] 40,41 * page 25, line 30 - page 28, line 2 * * page 40, line 7 - line 17 *; | [Y]WO2004048404 (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al) [Y] 40,41 * page 22, line 1 - line 30 * | [Y] - NORHEIM G ET AL, "Immunogenicity and bactericidal activity in mice of an outer membrane protein vesicle vaccine against Neisseria meningitidis serogroup A disease", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20040602), vol. 22, no. 17-18, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 2171 - 2180, XP004508733 [Y] 1-10,19-24,29-36,47 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2003.11.047 | [Y] - PEETERS C C A M ET AL, "Phase I clinical trial with a hexavalent PorA containing meningococcal outer membrane vesicle vaccine", VACCINE, (1996), vol. 14, no. 10, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1009 - 1015, XP004057633 [Y] 1-10,19-24,29-36,47 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(96)00001-1 |