EP1807174 - APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brightwater Engineering Limited Brightwater House, Business Centre East Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 7HB / GB | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANTWELL, Alan David Cole 5 St. Mary's Close, Aston Hertfordshire SG2 7EQ / GB | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Burrows, Anthony Gregory Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB | Application number, filing date | 05782693.5 | 02.09.2005 | [2007/29] | WO2005GB03418 | Priority number, date | GB20040020071 | 10.09.2004 Original published format: GB 0420071 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006027560 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1807174 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/18, B01D63/08, B01D65/08, C02F1/44, C02F3/12 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B01D61/18 (EP,US);
B01D63/0821 (EP,US);
B01D65/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/444 (EP,US);
C02F3/1273 (EP,US);
B01D2321/185 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2007/29] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2007/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE | [2007/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JPH08257378 ; | JPH08257378 [ ]; | [AX]JPH1033955 ; | JPH1033955 [ ]; | [YXA]JPH09299951 ; | [X]JPH09299951 ; | [XAY]JP2000317484 ; | JP3624281B [ ]; | [A]JPH07132214 ; | JP3119773B [ ]; | [XA]JPH11244674 ; | JPH11244674 [ ]; | [XAY]EP0602560 (KUBOTA KK [JP]); | [A]EP1156015 (VA TECH WABAG ESMIL GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2003150808 (MORIKAWA HIROFUMI [JP], et al); | by applicant | JPH08257378 | US2003150808 |