EP1796321 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, COMMUNICATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, COMMUNICATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Masanobu., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
GOBARA, Kunio., Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05783228.9 | 14.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005JP16937 | Priority number, date | JP20040279048 | 27.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004279048 | [2007/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006035601 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796321 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/46 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H04L12/2854 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/2553 (EP,US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L69/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2007/24] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, COMMUNICATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, COMMUNICATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2007/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D INFORMATIONS, MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT D INFORMATIONS, MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROGRAMME | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2007 | Translation filed | 20.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 01.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2005323033 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A] - SEN S. ET AL, "Midcom-unaware NAT/Firewall Traversal, Internet Draft, draft-sen-midcom-fw-nat-00.txt", (200109), URL: http://www.watersprings.org/pub/id/draft-sen-midcom-fw-nat-00.txt, (20051206), XP015035109 |