EP1925490 - BRAKE CONTROLLER AND BRAKE CONTROL METHOD OF ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEGORO, Hideto c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2008/22] | 01 /
NEGORO, Hideto c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha, 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05783284.2 | 15.09.2005 | [2008/22] | WO2005JP17046 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007032073 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925490 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925490 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60L7/24, B60T8/17 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
B60T13/586 (EP,US);
B60L7/14 (EP,US);
B60L7/26 (EP,US);
B60L9/22 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
B60L2210/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSSTEUERUNG UND BREMSSTEUERVERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTROFAHRZEUG | [2008/22] | English: | BRAKE CONTROLLER AND BRAKE CONTROL METHOD OF ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2008/22] | French: | RÉGULATEUR DE FREIN ET PROCÉDÉ RÉGULATEUR DE FREINAGE DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2007 | Translation filed | 14.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2005 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | LT | 27.02.2013 | LV | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | PL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | IS | 27.06.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | IE | 15.09.2013 | LU | 15.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 15.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
LV | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
LT | 27.02.2013 | ||
PL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
IS | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19810656 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, lines 12-21 * * column 5, lines 32-58 * * column 9, line 62 - column 10, line 32 * * figures 1, 5A, 5B * * abstract *; | [A]JP2002325306 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005033902 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-3* abstract * | International search | [X]JP2005033902 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH06253407 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH08251706 (TOSHIBA TRANSPORT ENG KK, et al) |