EP1840423 - GASKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15 Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAGI, Tokunori NOK CORPORATION 590-1, Jitohgata, Sagara-cho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 4210532 / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05783555.5 | 14.09.2005 | [2007/40] | WO2005JP16893 | Priority number, date | JP20050013865 | 21.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005013865 | [2007/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077677 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840423 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/12 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
F16J15/3268 (EP,US);
F16J15/3212 (EP,US);
F16J15/3224 (EP,US);
F16J15/3276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/18] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTUNG | [2007/40] | English: | GASKET | [2007/40] | French: | JOINT STATIQUE | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2007 | Translation filed | 01.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6140472U ; | [Y]JPH026897U ; | [Y]JPH07259692 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO); | [Y]JPH0942168 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002295341 (HINO MOTORS LTD); | [Y]JP2003035365 (KOYO SEALING TECHNO CO LTD) |