EP1925581 - CAR UPPER SIDE HANDRAIL DEVICE OF ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINDO, Kazuya c/o Inaryo Technica Co., Ltd. No.1, Hishi-machi Inazawa-shi, Aichi 4928661 / JP | 02 /
SAJIKI, Naohiko c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha, 7-3, Maruno uchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1008310 / JP | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05783678.5 | 16.09.2005 | [2008/22] | WO2005JP17133 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007032080 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925581 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
B66B5/0081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/52] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERE KABINENGELÄNDERVORRICHTUNG FÜR AUFZUG | [2008/22] | English: | CAR UPPER SIDE HANDRAIL DEVICE OF ELEVATOR | [2008/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RAMBARDE MONTE AU-DESSUS D UNE CABINE D ASCENSEUR | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2006 | Translation filed | 21.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2006 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 15.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 06.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1500623 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP1386876 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO03018459 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2005132547 ; | [Y]JPS3729874Y ; | [Y]WO03093157 |