EP1789092 - GLYCEROL BRANCHED POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL HUMAN GROWTH HORMONE CONJUGATES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001-0199 / US | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINN, Rory F. Pfizer Global Res. & Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017-1732 / US | 02 /
SIEGEL, Ned R. Pfizer Global Res. & Development 700 Chesterfield Parkway West Chesterfield, MO 63017-1732 / US | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | England, Peter Michael, et al Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | England, Peter Michael, et al Pfizer Limited European Pharma Patent Department (I.P.C. 748) Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05784225.4 | 25.08.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005IB02939 | Priority number, date | US20040605945P | 31.08.2004 Original published format: US 605945 P | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006024953 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1789092 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A61K47/60 (EP);
A61K38/27 (KR);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | 18.07.2007 | BA | 18.07.2007 | HR | 18.07.2007 | MK | 18.07.2007 | YU | 18.07.2007 | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHE WACHSTUMSHORMONKONJUGATE AUS GLYCEROL-VERZWEIGTEM POLYETHYLENGLYCOL, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2007/22] | English: | GLYCEROL BRANCHED POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL HUMAN GROWTH HORMONE CONJUGATES, PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION, AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2007/22] | French: | CONJUGUÉS DE L'HORMONE DE CROISSANCE HUMAINE AVEC DU POLYÉTHYLÈNEGLYCOL RAMIFIÉ À L'AIDE DE GLYCÉROL, PROCÉDÉ DE SA PRÉPARATION, ET MÉTHODE DE SON UTILISATION. | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 03.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH11228685 ; | [Y]WO2004046222 ; | [YD]WO9300109 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [YD] 1-12 * example I *; | [Y]EP0839849 (NOF CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * examples 5,6 *; | [Y]WO9903887 (BOLDER BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * example 1 *; | [Y]WO0042175 (BOLDER BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * example - *; | [DY]WO03044056 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [DY] 1-12 * examples 9-11 *; | [Y]WO2004022630 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS AL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * examples 5,9,10,13 *; | [Y]WO2004060406 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS AL CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * example 14 *; | [PX]WO2005000360 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS AL CORP [US], et al) [PX] 10-12* example 15 *; | [I] - CLARK R ET AL, "Long-acting growth hormones produced by conjugation with polyethylene glycol", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (19960906), vol. 271, no. 36, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21969 - 21977, XP002216386 [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 21971, column L * * page 21972, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.36.21969 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 44, Database accession no. 1999-522765, XP002335203 & JPH11228685 A 19990824 (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 42, Database accession no. 2004-449738, XP002335204 & WO2004046222 A1 20040603 (NOF CORP) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 34 * * page 49 - page 50 * * page 60 * * page 70 - page 71 * | [A] - KNAUF M J ET AL, "Relationship of effective molecular size to systemic clearance in rats of recombinant interleukin-2 chemically modified with water-soluble polymers", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 1988 UNITED STATES, (1988), vol. 263, no. 29, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15064 - 15070, XP002256084 [A] 1-12 * page 15064, column R - page 15065 * |