EP1841781 - IL-22 FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY, DIABETES, HYPERLIPIDEMIA, HYPERGLYCEMIA AND HYPERINSULINEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/41] | USE OF IL-22 FOR THE TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS OF METABOLIC DISORDERS | ||
[2010/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Generon (Shanghai) Corp. Suite 302/303, Building 9 1011 Ha Lei Road Z.J. Hi-Tech Park Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2011/10] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Dhy & Co., Ltd. Protcullis TrustNet Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Generon Corporation 7919 Paseo Aliso Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yu, Liang 7919 Paseo Aliso Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Xu, Wen 7919 Paseo Aliso Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Chaillot, Geneviève, et al Cabinet Chaillot 16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/41] | Kern, Antonia Schweiger & Partner Karlstrasse 35 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05784419.3 | 08.08.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005US28186 | Priority number, date | CN2005123103 | 04.01.2005 Original published format: CN200510023103 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006073508 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841781 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841781 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/00, C07K14/54, A61K38/00, A61K38/20, A61P3/04, A61P3/06, A61P3/10 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
A61K38/20 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/20, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/41] | C07K1/00, C07K14/54, A61K38/00, A61K38/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IL-22 ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FETTLEIBIGKEIT, DIABETES, HYPERLIPIDÄMIE, HYPERGLYKÄMIE UND INSULINRESISTENZ | [2010/34] | English: | IL-22 FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY, DIABETES, HYPERLIPIDEMIA, HYPERGLYCEMIA AND HYPERINSULINEMIA | [2010/34] | French: | UTILISATION DE L'IL-22 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'OBÉSITÉ, LA DIABÈTE, L'HYPERLIPÉMIE, L'HYPERGLYCÉMIE ET L'HYPERINSULINISME | [2010/34] |
Former [2007/41] | VERWENDUNG VON IL-22 ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFWECHSELSTÖRUNGEN | ||
Former [2007/41] | USE OF IL-22 FOR THE TREATMENT OF CONDITIONS OF METABOLIC DISORDERS | ||
Former [2007/41] | UTILISATION DE L'IL-22 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES METABOLIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HU | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | IE | 08.08.2011 | LU | 08.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
IE | 08.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9408606 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2001023070 (EBNER REINHARD [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 51, line 12, paragraph 329 *; | [AP] - WOLK KERSTIN ET AL, "Interleukin-22: A novel T- and NK-cell derived cytokine that regulates the biology of tissue cells", CYTOKINE & GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, (200610), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 1359-6101, pages 367 - 380, XP002468851 [AP] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cytogfr.2006.09.001 | International search | [Y]US4849227 (CHO YOUNG W [US]); | [X]US2001023070 (EBNER REINHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2003235561 (VANDENBURGH HERMAN H [US], et al) | Examination | - XIE ET AL, "Interleukin (IL)-22, a novel human cytokine that signals through the interferon receptor-related proteins CRF2-4 and IL-22R", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000629), vol. 275, no. 40, pages 31335 - 31339, XP002164307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M005304200 |