EP1784329 - BICYCLE SADDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTI Sports Vertrieb von Sportartikeln GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Straße 21 56220 Urmitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states RTI Sports Vertrieb von Sportartikeln GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 21 56220 Urmitz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHEFFER, Lutz Nuitstr. 1a 75173 Pforzheim / DE | 02 /
HEIMERDINGER, Andreas Habermehlstr. 17 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | von Kirschbaum, Alexander Patent Attorneys von Kreisler Selting Werner, Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05784522.4 | 01.09.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005EP54313 | Priority number, date | DE20042013746U | 01.09.2004 Original published format: DE 202004013746 U | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006024659 | Date: | 09.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1784329 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784329 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62J1/00 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
B62J1/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRRADSATTEL | [2007/20] | English: | BICYCLE SADDLE | [2007/20] | French: | SELLE DE BICYCLETTE | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 20.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08161281.4 / EP1980476 | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | IE | 30.07.2008 | LT | 30.07.2008 | LV | 30.07.2008 | PL | 30.07.2008 | RO | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | AT | 01.09.2008 | LU | 01.09.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | ES | 10.11.2008 | IS | 30.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | HU | 31.01.2009 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/40] | CY | 30.07.2008 | |
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
TR | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 01.09.2008 | ||
LU | 01.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 01.09.2008 | ||
LU | 01.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 01.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 01.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
AT | 01.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 30.07.2008 | |
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IE | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 30.07.2008 | |
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 30.07.2008 | |
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
ES | 10.11.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
IS | 30.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE91361 (PECK A. E.) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE172806 (J. B. BROOKS AND COMPANY LTD) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [X]US1881136 (WILHELM SCHMIDT) [X] 1,3-12,14,16 * the whole document *; | [X]DE824607 (WILHELM GEORG SCHMIDT) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,14-16 * the whole document *; | [X]US5203606 (GRANZOTTO ARTEMIO [CH]) [X] 1,3,5-8,14,16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0816214 (YOE INST CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]AT405812B (SPENGLE GMBH [AT]) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1076002 (URBAN VIOLA ULJANA [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,11,13-16 * column 2 - column 3; figures 9-11 *; | [A]US2001008348 (NELSON PAUL DAMIAN [AU]) [A] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0143]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO0194192 (DDTECHNO S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * page 4 - page 7; figures 1-6,11 *; | [X]US6357825 (BAVARESCO ROBERTO JOSE [IT]) [X] 1,6,8 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6371554 (KO JIN YOK [KR]) [X] 1-5,8 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6575529 (YU TSAI-YUN [TW]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3 |