EP1794453 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A TUBE FOR PERISTALTIC CASSETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEBIOTECH S.A. Immeuble "Le Portique" Rue de Sévelin 28 1004 Lausanne / CH | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUENI, Reto Place du Pré 2 CH-1053 Cugy / CH | [2007/33] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
CUENI, Reto Le Cheminet 16 CH-1162 St-Prex / CH | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 05784766.7 | 20.09.2005 | [2007/24] | WO2005IB53093 | Priority number, date | CH20040001559 | 23.09.2004 Original published format: CH 15592004 | [2007/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006033076 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1794453 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1794453 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/12, F04B43/00 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
F04B43/0072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINES SCHLAUCHS FÜR PERISTALTISCHE KASSETTEN | [2007/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING A TUBE FOR PERISTALTIC CASSETTE | [2007/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE TUBE POUR CASSETTE PERISTALTIQUE | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.07.2008 | CY | 09.07.2008 | CZ | 09.07.2008 | DK | 09.07.2008 | EE | 09.07.2008 | FI | 09.07.2008 | IE | 09.07.2008 | LT | 09.07.2008 | LV | 09.07.2008 | NL | 09.07.2008 | PL | 09.07.2008 | RO | 09.07.2008 | SI | 09.07.2008 | SK | 09.07.2008 | TR | 09.07.2008 | LU | 20.09.2008 | BE | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | BG | 09.10.2008 | SE | 09.10.2008 | GR | 10.10.2008 | ES | 20.10.2008 | IS | 09.11.2008 | PT | 09.12.2008 | HU | 10.01.2009 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/40] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
CY | 09.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
TR | 09.07.2008 | ||
LU | 20.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
HU | 10.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
LU | 20.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
PL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
SE | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
BE | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
CZ | 09.07.2008 | ||
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
RO | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
SK | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
EE | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
DK | 09.07.2008 | ||
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.07.2008 | |
FI | 09.07.2008 | ||
LT | 09.07.2008 | ||
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
SI | 09.07.2008 | ||
BG | 09.10.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
PT | 09.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 09.07.2008 | |
LV | 09.07.2008 | ||
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 09.07.2008 | |
NL | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB769789 (NEIL MACKINNON MACDONALD) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 ** page 3, line 52 - line 55 *; | [A]US5342181 (SCHOCK ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 6 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]EP1048848 (WATSON MARLOW LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1,5,6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US6494693 (SUNDEN BENGT [SE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 27 * * column 10, line 7 - line 21 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO03097156 (SCOTT LABOROTORIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 7, line 31 - page 10, line 24 * * page 11, line 20 - page 12, line 22 * * figures 3A,3B,5 * |