EP1796860 - MODIFYING SURFACES OF WORK-PIECES AND FORMING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOTZ, Walter Eggenweg 44 CH-8222 Beringen / CH | [2007/25] | Application number, filing date | 05785271.7 | 08.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP09630 | Priority number, date | EP20040405604 | 20.09.2004 Original published format: EP 04405604 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006032369 | Date: | 30.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796860 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1796860 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B21D13/02, B21D13/04, B21D22/02, C22C45/02, B21D37/20 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
B21D22/02 (EP);
B21D13/02 (EP);
B21D13/04 (EP);
B21D37/20 (EP);
C22C45/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, HU, IT, LI [2008/31] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIKATIONSFLÄCHEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN UND FORMWERKZEUG | [2007/25] | English: | MODIFYING SURFACES OF WORK-PIECES AND FORMING TOOLS | [2007/25] | French: | MODIFICATION DE SURFACES DE PIECES A USINER ET OUTILS DE FORMAGE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 28.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH10265917 ; | [A]JPS57187127 ; | [A]US2002018908 (SMITH TROY G [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 3-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10265917 A 19981006 (INOUE AKIHISA) [A] 1,15,21 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830208), vol. 007, no. 031, Database accession no. (M - 192), & JP57187127 A 19821117 (NISSAN MOTOR LTD) [A] 1,15,21 * abstract * |