EP1769462 - ARTIFACT-FREE CT ANFIOGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WISCONSIN ALUMNI RESEARCH FOUNDATION 614 North Walnut Street Madison, WI 53705 / US | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDOW, Joshua, Eric 7476 Old Sauk Road Madison, WI 53717 / US | 02 /
MISTRETTA, Charles, Anthony 843 Farwell Drive Madison, WI 53704 / US | 03 /
TOLAKANAHALLI, Ranjini, P. 2613 University Avenue Madison, WI 53705 / US | 04 /
HSIEH, Jiang 19970 West Keswick Court Brookfield, WI 53045-3784 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05785403.6 | 22.06.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005US22183 | Priority number, date | US20040887489 | 08.07.2004 Original published format: US 887489 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016985 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1769462 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, A61B6/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/027 (EP,US);
A61B6/481 (EP,US);
A61B6/504 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (EP,US);
A61B6/4085 (EP,US);
G06T2211/404 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTIFAKTFREIES CT-ANGIOGRAMM | [2007/14] | English: | ARTIFACT-FREE CT ANFIOGRAM | [2007/14] | French: | ANGIOGRAMME CT EXEMPT D'ARTÉFACTS | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 24.04.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0531993 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 9,10,13-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 16 - column 3, line 19 * * column 6, line 38 - column 8, line 35 * [Y] 11,12; | [DY]US5216601 (CRAWFORD CARL R [US], et al) [DY] 11,12 * abstract * * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 33; claim 1 *; | [DA]US5270923 (KING KEVIN F [US], et al) [DA] 9-16 * abstract ** column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 27 *; | [X]US6292527 (GUENDEL LUTZ [DE]) [X] 9-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 25 * * column 6, lines 42-62 *; | [A]US2001031032 (PROKSA ROLAND [DE]) [A] 9-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0013] , [0014] , [0023] - [0027] * |