EP1787968 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POROUS ARTICLE, POROUS ARTICLE AND HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 2-1 Kanda-cho, Ogaki-shi, Gifu Oogaki City 503-8604 / JP | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHNO, Kazushige c/o IBIDEN CO., LTD. Ogaki Kita Plant, 1-1, Kitaga ta, Ibigawa-cho, Ibi-gun, Gifu 5010695; / JP | 02 /
SATO, Hiroki c/o IBIDEN CO., LTD. Ogaki Kita Plant, 1-1, Kitaga ta, Ibigawa-cho, Ibi-gun, Gifu 5010695; / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Masayuki c/o IBIDEN CO., LTD. Ogaki Kita Plant, 1-1, Kitaga ta, Ibigawa-cho, Ibi-gun, Gifu 5010695; / JP | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05785476.2 | 21.09.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005JP17367 | Priority number, date | JP20040287908 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004287908 | [2007/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006035645 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787968 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787968 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B38/00, C04B35/565, B01D39/20, B01D46/24 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
B01D39/2075 (EP,US);
C04B35/6263 (EP,US);
C04B35/6303 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B38/0016 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00129 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2235/322 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/36 (EP,US);
C04B2235/383 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5472 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1314 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0006, C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B38/0016, C04B35/573, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0074 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/21] | C04B38/00, C04B35/565 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PORÖSENGEGENSTÄNDEN, PORÖSE GEGENSTÄNDE UND WABENSTRUKTUR | [2007/21] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POROUS ARTICLE, POROUS ARTICLE AND HONEYCOMB STRUCTURE | [2007/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D UN ARTICLE POREUX, ARTICLE POREUX ET STRUCTURE ALVEOLAIRE | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2007 | Translation filed | 27.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.06.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2005 | AT | 12.12.2012 | BE | 12.12.2012 | CY | 12.12.2012 | CZ | 12.12.2012 | DK | 12.12.2012 | EE | 12.12.2012 | FI | 12.12.2012 | IT | 12.12.2012 | LT | 12.12.2012 | LV | 12.12.2012 | MC | 12.12.2012 | NL | 12.12.2012 | PL | 12.12.2012 | RO | 12.12.2012 | SE | 12.12.2012 | SI | 12.12.2012 | SK | 12.12.2012 | TR | 12.12.2012 | BG | 12.03.2013 | GR | 13.03.2013 | ES | 23.03.2013 | IS | 12.04.2013 | PT | 12.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
TR | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
MC | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
IT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CY | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
DK | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
PT | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
NL | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
RO | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 12.12.2012 | |
BE | 12.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
PL | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
CZ | 12.12.2012 | ||
EE | 12.12.2012 | ||
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
SK | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
BG | 12.03.2013 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
IS | 12.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 12.12.2012 | |
FI | 12.12.2012 | ||
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
SI | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.03.2013 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
LV | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 12.12.2012 | |
LT | 12.12.2012 | ||
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 12.12.2012 | |
SE | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 12.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0369330 (NORTON CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4-9,12 * the whole document * * More particulatly: * * page 4, lines 36-49 * * claim - *; | [X]EP1277714 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [X] 7-12 * example - * * table - * * paragraph [0059] * * claim - *; | [X]EP1338322 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 7-12 * the whole document * * More particularly: * * paragraphs [0094] , [0149] * * claim - ** figure 19 *; | [E]WO2006028506 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [E] 1,2,7-9,12 * claims 1-7,24,25 * * figure - *; | [E]EP1652831 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document * * More particularly: * * paragraphs [0028] - [0034] - [0059] * * example - * * table - * * claim - *; | [E]EP1759754 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document * * More particularly: * * paragraphs [0028] - [0040] - [0067] * * example - * * table - * * claim - *; | [E]EP1808228 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document * * More particularly: * * paragraphs [0037] , [0040] * * example - * * table - * * claim - * | International search | [Y]JP2002234779 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]JP2001151579 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) |