EP1806051 - AUTOMATIC HYDROMASSAGE MACHINE FOR HOUSEHOLD PETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Netwash Aplicaciones Tecnicas del Lavado, S.L. C/Belgica, Nave 8 43120 Constant / ES | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLA CERVANTES, Francisco Polígono Industrial Constantí, C/Bélgica, Nave 8 E-43120 Constant / ES | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Canela Giménez, Teresa C/Girona no 148, 1o 2a 08037 Barcelona / ES | [2007/28] | Application number, filing date | 05785651.0 | 26.07.2005 | [2007/28] | WO2005ES00417 | Priority number, date | ES20040002332 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: ES 200402332 | [2007/28] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040365 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806051 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 20.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01K13/00 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
A01K13/001 (EP,ES,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE HYDROMASSAGEMASCHINE FÜR HAUSTIERE | [2007/28] | English: | AUTOMATIC HYDROMASSAGE MACHINE FOR HOUSEHOLD PETS | [2007/28] | French: | MACHINE AUTOMATIQUE D'HYDROMASSAGE POUR ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2007 | Translation filed | 04.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 27.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0034123 (HOGAR SRL [IT]); | [A]US4505229 (ALTISSIMO MARIO [IT]); | [A]FR2747011 (BARRAIRON RENE [FR]); | [Y]ES2154888T (LEADERCAN S L); | [Y]WO03079774 (ANGEL SEGURA MUNOZ [ES], et al) | by applicant | US3884191 | FR2543795 | US4505229 | FR2753877 | ES1043452U |