EP1928564 - GOLF PUTTING PRACTICE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esoteric Golf Technology International AB Sveagatan 12 413 14 Göteborg / SE | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHL, Thomas Sveagatan 23 B S-413 14 Göteborg / SE | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Romare, Laila Anette Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Romare, Laila Anette Albihns Göteborg AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 05786175.9 | 21.09.2005 | [2008/24] | WO2005SE01389 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007035142 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1928564 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/36 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A63B69/3676 (EP,US);
A63B24/0003 (EP,US);
A63B69/3621 (EP,US);
A63B69/3667 (EP,US);
A63B69/3682 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0694 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GOLFPUTTINGÜBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/24] | English: | GOLF PUTTING PRACTICE DEVICE | [2008/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR LE ROULER AU GOLF | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2009 | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4732390 (MCCOLLUM THOMAS H [US]); | [X]US4913440 (ELLINGTON CARROLL M [US]); | [A]US3113780 (GOULD LIVINGSTONE JAY) |