EP1773963 - 1-ETHOXY-1,1,2,2,3,3,4,4,4-NONAFLUOROBUTANE REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FUNCTIONALIZED ORGANIC COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINOR, Barbara, Haviland 233 Greenhaven Drive Elkton, Maryland 21921 / US | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05786183.3 | 21.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005US21804 | Priority number, date | US20040584785P | 29.06.2004 Original published format: US 584785 P | US20050153804 | 15.06.2005 Original published format: US 153804 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006012100 | Date: | 02.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1773963 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/00 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
C09K5/04 (KR);
C09K5/00 (KR);
C09K2205/102 (EP,US);
C09K2205/104 (EP,US);
C09K2205/108 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1-ETHOXY-1,1,2,2,3,3,4,4,4-NONAFLUOROBUTAN-KÜHLMITTEL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FUNKTIONALISIERTEN ORGANISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2007/16] | English: | 1-ETHOXY-1,1,2,2,3,3,4,4,4-NONAFLUOROBUTANE REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING FUNCTIONALIZED ORGANIC COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2007/16] | French: | COMPOSITIONS FRIGORIGENES A BASE DE 1-ETHOXY-1,1,2,2,3,3,4,4,4-NONAFLUOROBUTANE COMPRENANT DES COMPOSES ORGANIQUES FONCTIONNALISES ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 26.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9636688 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [Y]US2003209688 (LEE ROBERT A [US], et al); | [Y]US5713211 (SHERWOOD GREGORY J [US]); | [Y]US5681984 (CAVESTRI RICHARD C [US]) |