EP1797490 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A PWM SIGNAL ON WHICH A DITHER FREQUENCY IS SUPERIMPOSED IN ORDER TO CONTROL A SOLENOID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISSLER, Jose Kühbergstr. 22 93077 Bad Abbach / DE | 02 /
RÖHRL, Thomas Lilienweg 23 93092 Barbing / DE | [2007/25] | Application number, filing date | 05786895.2 | 14.09.2005 | [2007/25] | WO2005EP54567 | Priority number, date | DE20041048706 | 06.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004048706 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006037715 | Date: | 13.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797490 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1797490 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/20, H01F7/08 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
G05D16/2013 (EP,US);
F16K31/0675 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/405 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0255 (EP,US);
H01F2007/1888 (EP,US);
H01F7/1838 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINES MIT EINER DITHERFREQUENZ ÜBERLAGERTEN PWM-SIGNALS ZUR STEUERUNG EINES MAGNETVENTILS | [2007/25] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A PWM SIGNAL ON WHICH A DITHER FREQUENCY IS SUPERIMPOSED IN ORDER TO CONTROL A SOLENOID VALVE | [2007/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER UN SIGNAL PWM SUR LEQUEL UNE FREQUENCE DE TREMBLEMENT EST SUPERPOSEE POUR COMMANDER UNE VANNE MAGNETIQUE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 08.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IE | 11.02.2009 | LT | 11.02.2009 | LV | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | PL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | SE | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | ES | 22.05.2009 | IS | 11.06.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | HU | 12.08.2009 | AT | 14.09.2009 | GB | 14.09.2009 | LU | 14.09.2009 | BE | 30.09.2009 | CH | 30.09.2009 | LI | 30.09.2009 | MC | 30.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
AT | 14.09.2009 | ||
GB | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 14.09.2009 | ||
GB | 14.09.2009 | ||
LU | 14.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
AT | 14.09.2009 | ||
GB | 14.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.09.2009 | ||
LI | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/40] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 30.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
MC | 30.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
PL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
SE | 11.05.2009 | ||
ES | 22.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4960365 (HORIUCHI HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]DE4423102 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0929020 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0033] * |