EP1802545 - A CORE FOR A ROLL OF MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Real Time Logistics Solutions Limited Unit 4, Cobbett Park, 22-28 Moorfield Road Slyfield Industrial Estate Guildford Surrey GU1 1RU / GB | [2010/50] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states RFTRAQ Limited Unit 4 Cobbett Park 22-28 Moorfiled Road Slyfield Industrial Estate Guilford Surrey GU1 1RU / GB | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states RFTRAQ Limited 5 Prince's Gate Knightsbridge London SW7 1QJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Core Control International Limited Unit 24, Trade City Brooklands, Avro Way Weybridge KT13 0XQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILTON, Peter George 304 Broadway Gillingham, Kent ME8 6DU / GB | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Jones, Graham Henry, et al Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Jones, Graham Henry, et al Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | ||
Former [2008/28] | Jones, Graham Henry, et al Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company 77 Beaconsfield Road GB-Blackheath, London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 05787347.3 | 23.09.2005 | [2007/27] | WO2005GB03699 | Priority number, date | GB20040023409 | 21.10.2004 Original published format: GB 0423409 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006043021 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1802545 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1802545 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/18 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
B65H75/185 (EP,US);
B65H75/18 (GB);
B65H75/182 (EP,US);
B65H2553/52 (EP,US);
B65H2701/515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KERN FÜR EINE MATERIALROLLE | [2007/27] | English: | A CORE FOR A ROLL OF MATERIAL | [2007/27] | French: | MANDRIN POUR ROULEAU DE MATERIAU | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.12.2009 | Observations by third parties | 02.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2011 | 06.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | LU | 23.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/20] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.03.2011 | |
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1671724 (THOMAS JOHANCEN, et al); | [A]US3713601 (BUHRMAN R, et al); | [A]US5657944 (KEWIN DANIEL D [CA]); | [A]US5829713 (KEWIN DANIEL D [CA]); | [X]US5857643 (CZUPRYNSKI DANIEL MARTIN [US], et al); | [X]FR2848272 (ROLL & CONCEPT [FR]); | [DA]GB2400093 (MILTON PETER GEORGE [GB]); | [PX]US2004245368 (KEWIN DANIEL D [CA]) | other | US2004102869 |